Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2823 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 13, 2011      TO: Honorable Sid Miller, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2823 by Coleman (Relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Occupations Code relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making. The Commission on Law Enforcement Officers Standards and Education indicates that creating the course materials will cause the agency to incur a one-time cost, but no recurring or significant costs.  The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2011. Local Government Impact The bill would require a peace officer or reserve law enforcement officer to complete an eight-hour training program on ethical decision making to be approved by the Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education (Commission). An officer would be required to complete the training once during the year beginning on September 1, 2012, and once every 24 months for the two Commission training cycles beginning September 1, 2013.  The Waco Police Department anticipates costs of $17,312 for Fiscal Year (FY) 2012, $18,178 for FY 2013, $19,086 for FY 2014, $20,040 for FY 2015, and $21,043 for FY 2016 to comply with the provisions of the bill. The Travis County Sheriffs Office anticipates a cost of $131,120 each year for FY 2012, 2014 and 2016 to comply with the provisions of the bill, and no costs for FY 2013 and 2015.    Source Agencies:407 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education   LBB Staff:  JOB, ESi, GG, DAR, KKR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 13, 2011





  TO: Honorable Sid Miller, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2823 by Coleman (Relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Sid Miller, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2823 by Coleman (Relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making.), As Introduced

 Honorable Sid Miller, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety 

 Honorable Sid Miller, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2823 by Coleman (Relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making.), As Introduced

HB2823 by Coleman (Relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Occupations Code relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making. The Commission on Law Enforcement Officers Standards and Education indicates that creating the course materials will cause the agency to incur a one-time cost, but no recurring or significant costs.  The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2011.

The bill would amend the Occupations Code relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace officers on ethical decision making. The Commission on Law Enforcement Officers Standards and Education indicates that creating the course materials will cause the agency to incur a one-time cost, but no recurring or significant costs. 

The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2011.

Local Government Impact

The bill would require a peace officer or reserve law enforcement officer to complete an eight-hour training program on ethical decision making to be approved by the Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education (Commission). An officer would be required to complete the training once during the year beginning on September 1, 2012, and once every 24 months for the two Commission training cycles beginning September 1, 2013.  The Waco Police Department anticipates costs of $17,312 for Fiscal Year (FY) 2012, $18,178 for FY 2013, $19,086 for FY 2014, $20,040 for FY 2015, and $21,043 for FY 2016 to comply with the provisions of the bill. The Travis County Sheriffs Office anticipates a cost of $131,120 each year for FY 2012, 2014 and 2016 to comply with the provisions of the bill, and no costs for FY 2013 and 2015.

Source Agencies: 407 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education

407 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education

LBB Staff: JOB, ESi, GG, DAR, KKR

 JOB, ESi, GG, DAR, KKR