Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2831 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2831
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maximizing federal funding of extended unemployment
 benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 209, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 209.025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 209.025.  FEDERAL FUNDING OF EXTENDED BENEFITS.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter, the
 commission by rule may adjust the extended benefit eligibility
 period as necessary to maximize the receipt of any fully funded
 federal extended unemployment benefits, if full federal funding for
 those benefits is available.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *