Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB290 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 290
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 28, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 23, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 290 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the punishment for the offense of employment harmful to
 children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.251(c), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is:
 (1)  a state jail felony if it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the defendant has been previously convicted one
 time of an offense under this section; and
 (2)  a felony of the third degree if it is shown on the
 trial of the offense that the defendant has been previously
 convicted two or more times of an offense under this section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *