Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2909 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Branch (Senate Sponsor - Shapiro) H.B. No. 2909
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 20, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2909 By:  Shapiro


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing awareness in this state of the importance of
 higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 29.911, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.911.  GENERATION TEXAS ["EDUCATION:  GO GET IT"]
 WEEK.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 29.911(a) and (b), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To educate middle school, junior high school, and high
 school students about the importance of higher education, each
 school district and each open-enrollment charter school offering
 any of those grade levels shall designate one week during the school
 year as Generation Texas ["Education:  Go Get It"] Week.
 (b)  During the designated week, each middle school, junior
 high school, and high school shall provide students with
 comprehensive grade-appropriate information regarding the pursuit
 of higher education.  The information provided must include
 information regarding:
 (1)  higher education options available to students;
 (2)  standard admission requirements for institutions
 of higher education, including:
 (A)  overall high school grade point average;
 (B)  required curriculum; [and]
 (C)  college readiness standards and expectations
 as determined under Section 28.008; and
 (D)  scores necessary on generally recognized
 tests or assessment instruments used in admissions determinations,
 including the Scholastic Assessment Test and the American College
 Test;
 (3)  automatic admission of certain students to general
 academic teaching institutions as provided by Section 51.803; and
 (4)  financial aid availability and requirements,
 including the financial aid information provided by counselors
 under Section 33.007(b).
 SECTION 3.  Section 61.076(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The co-chairs may appoint six [three] additional
 members who are education professionals, agency representatives,
 business representatives, or other members of the community.
 Members appointed to the council under this subsection serve
 two-year terms expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 SECTION 4.  Section 61.9701(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The campaign must [may] include the provision of
 information on:
 (1)  the benefits of obtaining a postsecondary
 education;
 (2)  the types of institutions of higher education and
 degree programs available;
 (3)  the academic preparation needed to successfully
 pursue a postsecondary education as determined under Section 28.008
 and any other requirements for enrollment at an institution of
 higher education; and
 (4)  how to obtain financial aid and what forms of
 financial aid are available.
 SECTION 5.  Section 61.9703, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.9703.  COORDINATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES [AGENCIES].
 The board shall [may] coordinate with the Texas Education Agency,
 the P-16 Council established under Section 61.076, and other
 appropriate entities, including regional P-16 councils and
 businesses, to [agencies as necessary to develop and] implement the
 public awareness campaign.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *