Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2936 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Castro (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2936
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of district courts in Bexar County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.139, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b), (d), and (e) and adding Subsection (e-1)
 to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies to the 37th, 45th, 57th, 73rd,
 131st, 144th, 150th, 166th, 175th, 186th, 187th, 224th, 225th,
 226th, 227th, 285th, 288th, 289th, [and] 290th, 379th, 386th,
 399th, 407th, 408th, 436th, 437th, and 438th district courts in
 Bexar County.
 (d)  The 144th, 175th, 186th, 187th, 226th, 227th, 289th,
 [and] 290th, 379th, 399th, and 437th district courts shall give
 preference to criminal cases. The terms of those courts begin on
 the first Mondays in January and July. Each term continues until
 the court has disposed of the business for that term.
 (e)  The terms of the 37th, 45th, 57th, 73rd, 131st, 150th,
 166th, 224th, 225th, 285th, [and] 288th, 407th, 408th, and 438th
 district courts begin on the first Mondays in January and July.
 (e-1)  The 386th and 436th district courts shall give
 preference to juvenile matters under Title 3, Family Code.  The
 terms of those courts begin on the first Mondays in July and
 January.  Each term continues until the court has disposed of the
 business for that term.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.466(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The 289th District Court shall give primary preference
 to juvenile matters [cases and proceedings] under Title [2,] 3, [or
 5,] Family Code, and secondary preference to criminal cases.
 SECTION 3.  Section 24.531(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The 386th District Court shall give preference to
 juvenile matters under Title 3, Family Code.
 SECTION 4.  Section 24.580(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The 436th District Court shall give preference to
 juvenile matters under Title 3, Family Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *