Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2959 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 2959
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2959 By:  Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the required transfer of records to a new county chair
 of a political party; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 171.028, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  A person commits an offense if the person fails to
 transfer records as required by Subsection (a).
 (d)  An offense under Subsection (c) is a Class C
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *