Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2971 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smith of Tarrant (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 2971
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of documents evaluating the
 performance of public school teachers and administrators.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.355, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 21.355.  CONFIDENTIALITY. A document evaluating the
 performance of a teacher or administrator, including a teacher or
 administrator employed by an open-enrollment charter school, is
 confidential.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.355, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies to each document described by that section,
 regardless of whether the document was created before, on, or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *