Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2981 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2981
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 20, 2011, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2981 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation on a highway or street of a motor vehicle
 that is drawing a boat or personal watercraft in or on which a child
 is riding; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 545, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 545.4145 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.4145.  RIDING IN OR ON BOAT OR PERSONAL WATERCRAFT
 DRAWN BY VEHICLE; OFFENSE. (a) A person commits an offense if the
 person operates a motor vehicle on a highway or street when a child
 younger than 18 years of age is occupying a boat or personal
 watercraft being drawn by the motor vehicle.
 (b)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the person was:
 (1)  operating the motor vehicle in a parade or in an
 emergency; or
 (2)  operating the motor vehicle on a beach.
 (c)  In this section, "boat" and "personal watercraft" have
 the meanings assigned by Section 31.003, Parks and Wildlife Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *