Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3093 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 3093
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amendment of certain reports of political
 contributions and expenditures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 254, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 254.0405 to read as follows:
 Sec. 254.0405.  AMENDMENT OF FILED REPORT. (a)  A person
 who files a semiannual report under this chapter may amend the
 report.
 (b)  A semiannual report that is amended before the eighth
 day after the date the original report was filed is considered to
 have been filed on the date on which the original report was filed.
 (c)  A semiannual report that is amended on or after the
 eighth day after the original report was filed is considered to have
 been filed on the date on which the original report was filed if:
 (1)  the amendment is made before any complaint is
 filed with regard to the subject of the amendment; and
 (2)  the original report was made in good faith and
 without an intent to mislead or to misrepresent the information
 contained in the report.
 SECTION 2.  Section 254.041, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  It is an exception to the application of Subsection
 (a)(3) that:
 (1)  the information was required to be included in a
 semiannual report; and
 (2)  the person amended the report within the time
 prescribed by Section 254.0405(b) or under the circumstances
 described by Section 254.0405(c).
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 254.041, Election Code, applies only to an offense committed on or
 after the effective date of this Act. For purposes of this section,
 an offense is committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurs before the effective date. An offense
 committed before the effective date of this Act is covered by the
 law in effect when the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *