Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3109 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3109


 AN ACT
 relating to the rulemaking power of certain groundwater
 conservation districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.121, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.121.  LIMITATION ON RULEMAKING POWER OF DISTRICTS
 OVER WELLS IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. Except as provided by Section
 36.117, a district that is created under this chapter on or after
 September 1, 1991, shall exempt from regulation under this chapter
 a well and any water produced or to be produced by a well that is
 located in a county that has a population of 14,000 or less if the
 water is to be used solely to supply a municipality that has a
 population of 121,000 or less and the rights to the water produced
 from the well are owned by a political subdivision that is not a
 municipality, or by a municipality that has a population of 115,000
 [100,000] or less, and that purchased, owned, or held rights to the
 water before the date on which the district was created, regardless
 of the date the well is drilled or the water is produced. The
 district may not prohibit the political subdivision or municipality
 from transporting produced water inside or outside the district's
 boundaries.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3109 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3109 on May 26, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3109 on May 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3109 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3109 on May 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor