Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3109 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3109
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 20, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3109 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rulemaking power of certain groundwater
 conservation districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.121, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.121.  LIMITATION ON RULEMAKING POWER OF DISTRICTS
 OVER WELLS IN CERTAIN COUNTIES.  Except as provided by Section
 36.117, a district that is created under this chapter on or after
 September 1, 1991, shall exempt from regulation under this chapter
 a well and any water produced or to be produced by a well that is
 located in a county that has a population of 14,000 or less if the
 water is to be used solely to supply a municipality that has a
 population of 121,000 or less but greater than 100,000 and the
 rights to the water produced from the well are owned by a political
 subdivision that is not a municipality, or by a municipality that
 has a population of 115,000 [100,000] or less but greater than
 100,000, and that purchased, owned, or held rights to the water
 before the date on which the district was created, regardless of the
 date the well is drilled or the water is produced.  The district may
 not prohibit the political subdivision or municipality from
 transporting produced water inside or outside the district's
 boundaries.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *