Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3117 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Vo (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3117
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 21, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3117 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of information to claims databases by
 insurers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 561 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 561.  PROHIBITED RATING PRACTICES
 Sec. 561.001.  DEFINITIONS.  For the purposes of this
 chapter:
 (1)  "Customer inquiry" means a telephone call or other
 communication made to an insurer that does not result in an
 investigation or claim and that is in regard to the general terms or
 conditions of or coverage offered under an insurance policy.  The
 term includes a question concerning the process for filing a claim
 and whether a policy will cover a loss unless the question concerns
 specific damage that has occurred and results in an investigation
 or claim.
 (2)  "Personal automobile insurance" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 38.002.
 (3)  "Residential property insurance" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 38.002.
 (4)  "Claims database" means a database used by
 insurers to share, among insurers, insureds' claims histories or
 damage reports concerning covered properties.
 Sec. 561.002.  APPLICABILITY.  This chapter applies only to
 residential property insurance and personal automobile insurance,
 including an insurance policy written by a county mutual insurance
 company.
 Sec. 561.003.  CONSIDERATION OF CUSTOMER INQUIRIES
 PROHIBITED.  An insurer may not base, wholly or partly, an adverse
 underwriting or rating decision on a customer inquiry or report
 such an inquiry to a claims database.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an insurance policy or
 contract that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or
 after January 1, 2012.  An insurance policy or contract delivered,
 issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2012, is governed
 by the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of
 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *