Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3234 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez Luna, Naishtat, Rodriguez H.B. No. 3234
 (Senate Sponsor - Davis)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 27, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prioritization of requests to release certain case
 records maintained by the Department of Family and Protective
 Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.0145 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.0145.  RELEASE OF CASE RECORD.  (a)  In this
 section, "case record" means those files, reports, records,
 communications, audiotapes, videotapes, or working papers under
 the custody and control of the department that are collected,
 developed, or used:
 (1)  in a child abuse or neglect investigation; or
 (2)  in providing services as a result of an
 investigation, including substitute care services for a child.
 (b)  The department by rule shall establish guidelines that
 prioritize requests to release case records, including those made
 by an adult previously in the department's managing
 conservatorship.
 (c)  The department is not required to release a copy of the
 case record except as provided by law and department rule.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *