Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3270 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Veasey (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 3270
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the list of candidates compiled by a state or county
 party chair for a primary election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 172.029(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  For each general primary election, the state chair and
 each county chair shall prepare a list containing:
 (1)  the name of each candidate who files an
 application for a place on the ballot with the chair, including an
 application for the office of a political party, as the name is to
 appear on the ballot;
 (2)  the candidate's address as shown on the
 application; and
 (3)  the date on which the candidate filed the
 application.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *