Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3302 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3302


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain Type A economic development
 corporations to undertake certain categories of projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 504.171 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.171.  AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN CORPORATIONS TO
 UNDERTAKE TYPE B PROJECTS. (a) This section applies only to a Type
 A corporation the creation of which was authorized by a
 municipality:
 (1)  that has also authorized the creation of a Type B
 corporation; and
 (2)  that has a population of 7,500 or less.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 504.152, if permitted by
 ordinance of the authorizing municipality, a Type A corporation to
 which this section applies may undertake any project that a Type B
 corporation, the creation of which was authorized by the same
 municipality, may undertake under Chapter 505.
 (c)  The governing body of an authorizing municipality may by
 ordinance revoke any authority granted to a Type A corporation
 under Subsection (b). A revocation under this subsection does not
 affect the authority of a corporation to complete a project already
 undertaken or the obligation to repay any debt incurred in
 connection with a project under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3302 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3302 on May 21, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3302 on May 26, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3302 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3302 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0
 .
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor