H.B. No. 3302 AN ACT relating to the authority of certain Type A economic development corporations to undertake certain categories of projects. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Section 504.171 to read as follows: Sec. 504.171. AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN CORPORATIONS TO UNDERTAKE TYPE B PROJECTS. (a) This section applies only to a Type A corporation the creation of which was authorized by a municipality: (1) that has also authorized the creation of a Type B corporation; and (2) that has a population of 7,500 or less. (b) Notwithstanding Section 504.152, if permitted by ordinance of the authorizing municipality, a Type A corporation to which this section applies may undertake any project that a Type B corporation, the creation of which was authorized by the same municipality, may undertake under Chapter 505. (c) The governing body of an authorizing municipality may by ordinance revoke any authority granted to a Type A corporation under Subsection (b). A revocation under this subsection does not affect the authority of a corporation to complete a project already undertaken or the obligation to repay any debt incurred in connection with a project under Subsection (b). SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3302 was passed by the House on April 21, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3302 on May 21, 2011, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3302 on May 26, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3302 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 18, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3302 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0 . ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor