Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3311 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carter (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3311
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duty of an attorney ad litem appointed for a child
 to meet with the child or individual with whom the child resides
 before each court hearing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 107.004, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  A meeting required by Subsection (d) must take place:
 (1)  a sufficient time before the hearing to allow the
 attorney ad litem to prepare for the hearing in accordance with the
 child's expressed objectives of representation; and
 (2)  in a private setting that allows for confidential
 communications between the attorney ad litem and the child or
 individual with whom the child ordinarily resides, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *