Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3328 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3328


 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure of the composition of hydraulic
 fracturing fluids used in hydraulic fracturing treatments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 91, Natural Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter S to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER S. DISCLOSURE OF COMPOSITION OF HYDRAULIC FRACTURING
 FLUIDS
 Sec. 91.851.  DISCLOSURE OF COMPOSITION OF HYDRAULIC
 FRACTURING FLUIDS. (a) The commission by rule shall:
 (1)  require an operator of a well on which a hydraulic
 fracturing treatment is performed to:
 (A)  complete the form posted on the hydraulic
 fracturing chemical registry Internet website of the Ground Water
 Protection Council and the Interstate Oil and Gas Compact
 Commission with regard to the well;
 (B)  include in the form completed under Paragraph
 (A):
 (i)  the total volume of water used in the
 hydraulic fracturing treatment; and
 (ii)  each chemical ingredient that is
 subject to the requirements of 29 C.F.R. Section 1910.1200(g)(2),
 as provided by a service company or chemical supplier or by the
 operator, if the operator provides its own chemical ingredients;
 (C)  post the completed form described by
 Paragraph (A) on the website described by that paragraph or, if the
 website is discontinued or permanently inoperable, post the
 completed form on another publicly accessible Internet website
 specified by the commission;
 (D)  submit the completed form described by
 Paragraph (A) to the commission with the well completion report for
 the well; and
 (E)  in addition to the completed form specified
 in Paragraph (D), provide to the commission a list, to be made
 available on a publicly accessible website, of all other chemical
 ingredients not listed on the completed form that were
 intentionally included and used for the purpose of creating a
 hydraulic fracturing treatment for the well. The commission rule
 shall ensure that an operator, service company, or supplier is not
 responsible for disclosing ingredients that:
 (i)  were not purposely added to the
 hydraulic fracturing treatment;
 (ii)  occur incidentally or are otherwise
 unintentionally present in the treatment; or
 (iii)  in the case of the operator, are not
 disclosed to the operator by a service company or supplier. The
 commission rule shall not require that the ingredients be
 identified based on the additive in which they are found or that the
 concentration of such ingredients be provided;
 (2)  require a service company that performs a
 hydraulic fracturing treatment on a well or a supplier of an
 additive used in a hydraulic fracturing treatment on a well to
 provide the operator of the well with the information necessary for
 the operator to comply with Subdivision (1);
 (3)  prescribe a process by which an entity required to
 comply with Subdivision (1) or (2) may withhold and declare certain
 information as a trade secret for purposes of Section 552.110,
 Government Code, including the identity and amount of the chemical
 ingredient used in a hydraulic fracturing treatment;
 (4)  require a person who desires to challenge a claim
 of entitlement to trade secret protection under Subdivision (3) to
 file the challenge not later than the second anniversary of the date
 the relevant well completion report is filed with the commission;
 (5)  limit the persons who may challenge a claim of
 entitlement to trade secret protection under Subdivision (3) to:
 (A)  the landowner on whose property the relevant
 well is located;
 (B)  a landowner who owns property adjacent to
 property described by Paragraph (A); or
 (C)  a department or agency of this state with
 jurisdiction over a matter to which the claimed trade secret is
 relevant;
 (6)  require, in the event of a trade secret challenge,
 that the commission promptly notify the service company performing
 the hydraulic fracturing treatment on the relevant well, the
 supplier of the additive or chemical ingredient for which the trade
 secret claim is made, or any other owner of the trade secret being
 challenged and provide the owner an opportunity to substantiate its
 trade secret claim; and
 (7)  prescribe a process, consistent with 29 C.F.R.
 Section 1910.1200, for an entity described by Subdivision (1) or
 (2) to provide information, including information that is a trade
 secret as defined by Appendix D to 29 C.F.R. Section 1910.1200, to a
 health professional or emergency responder who needs the
 information in accordance with Subsection (i) of that section.
 (b)  The protection and challenge of trade secrets under this
 section is governed by Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter S, Chapter 91, Natural Resources
 Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a hydraulic fracturing
 treatment performed on a well for which an initial drilling permit
 is issued on or after the date the initial rules adopted by the
 Railroad Commission of Texas under that subchapter take effect. A
 hydraulic fracturing treatment performed on a well for which an
 initial drilling permit is issued before the date the initial rules
 take effect is governed by the law as it existed immediately before
 the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  The Railroad Commission of Texas shall adopt
 rules under Subchapter S, Chapter 91, Natural Resources Code, as
 added by this Act, not later than July 1, 2012, with the exception
 of those rules under Paragraph (E), which are to be adopted not
 later than July 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3328 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 12, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3328 on May 27, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3328 on May 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 137,
 Nays 8, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3328 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3328 on May 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor