Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3342 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 3342
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 16, 2011, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 16, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3342 By:  Rodriguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to representation of and by the state and joinder of the
 state in certain mental health proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 571.016, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 571.016.  REPRESENTATION OF STATE. Unless specified
 otherwise, in a hearing held under this subtitle, including a
 hearing held under Subchapter G, Chapter 574:
 (1)  the county attorney shall represent the state; or
 (2)  if the county has no county attorney, the district
 attorney, the criminal district attorney, or a court-appointed
 special prosecutor shall represent the state.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 571, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 571.0167 to read as follows:
 Sec. 571.0167.  HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDINGS. (a)  A petition
 for a writ of habeas corpus arising from a commitment order must be
 filed in the court of appeals for the county in which the order is
 entered.
 (b)  The state shall be made a party in a habeas corpus
 proceeding described in subsection (a).  The appropriate attorney
 prescribed by Section 571.016 shall represent the state.
 (c)  In a habeas corpus proceeding in which a state inpatient
 mental facility or a physician employed by a state impatient mental
 health facility is a party as a result of enforcing a commitment
 order, the appropriate attorney prescribed by Section 571.016 shall
 represent the facility or physician, or both the facility and
 physician if both are parties, unless the attorney determines that
 representation violates the Texas Disciplinary Rules of
 Professional Conduct.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a hearing or proceeding that commences on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A hearing or proceeding that commences before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the hearing or proceeding commenced, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *