Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB336 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Marquez (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 336
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 20, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing and posting on the Internet of reports of
 political contributions and expenditures required in connection
 with the office of member of the board of trustees of certain school
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 254, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 254.04011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 254.04011.  AVAILABILITY OF REPORTS OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES
 ON INTERNET. (a) This section applies only to a school district
 located wholly or partly in a municipality with a population of more
 than 500,000.
 (b)  A report filed under this chapter by a member of the
 board of trustees of a school district, a candidate for membership
 on the board of trustees of a school district, or a specific-purpose
 committee for supporting, opposing, or assisting a candidate or
 member of a board of trustees of a school district must be posted on
 the Internet website of the school district.
 (c)  A report to which Subsection (b) applies must be
 available to the public on the Internet website not later than the
 fifth business day after the date the report is filed with the
 school district.
 (d)  The access allowed by this section to reports is in
 addition to the public's access to the information through other
 electronic or print distribution of the information.
 (e)  Before making a report available on the Internet under
 this section, the school district may remove each portion, other
 than city, state, and zip code, of the address of a person listed as
 having made a political contribution to the person filing the
 report. If the address information is removed as permitted by this
 subsection, the information must remain available on the report
 maintained in the school district's office.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act by adding
 Section 254.04011, Election Code, applies only to the posting of a
 report of political contributions and expenditures that is required
 to be filed on or after January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *