Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB34 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Branch, Lewis, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Shapiro) H.B. No. 34
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to including in the public high school curriculum
 instruction in methods of paying for postsecondary education and
 training.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.0021, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (b) and (c) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  The Texas essential knowledge and skills and Section
 28.025 shall require instruction in personal financial literacy,
 including instruction in methods of paying for college and other
 postsecondary education and training, in one or more courses
 required for high school graduation.
 (b)  Each school district and each open-enrollment charter
 school that offers a high school program shall provide to a student
 instruction in personal financial literacy in any course meeting
 the requirements for an economics credit under Section 28.025,
 using materials approved by the State Board of Education.  The
 instruction in personal financial literacy must include
 instruction on completing the application for federal student aid
 provided by the United States Department of Education. In
 fulfilling the requirement to provide financial literacy
 instruction under this section, a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school may use an existing state, federal,
 private, or nonprofit program that provides students without charge
 the instruction described under this section.
 (c)  The State Board of Education shall, not later than
 January 31, 2012, identify the essential knowledge and skills of
 personal financial literacy instruction to include instruction in
 methods of paying for college and other postsecondary education and
 training and shall, not later than August 31, 2012, approve under
 Subsection (b) materials that provide for such instruction.
 Beginning with the 2013-2014 school year, each school district and
 each open-enrollment charter school that offers a high school
 program shall include, in required instruction in personal
 financial literacy, instruction in methods of paying for college
 and other postsecondary education and training and use materials
 approved for that purpose under Subsection (b). This subsection
 expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.0021(c), Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to a student entering grade nine on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *