By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3404 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011; April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to establishing a child care advisory committee to advise the Texas Facilities Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 663.051, Government Code, is reenacted and amended to read as follows: Sec. 663.051. ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The commission shall appoint a child care advisory committee composed of individuals who are interested in child care services for state employees. (b) The commission may appoint to the committee: (1) the executive directors of: (A) the commission; and (B) the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs; (2) two representatives of nonprofit organizations involved with the delivery or support of child care services; (3) [a representative of the corporate child development fund; [(4)] a representative of child care providers; (4) [(5)] one or more state employees subject to the state classification plan: (A) each of whom has at least one child in a child care facility; and (B) if more than one is appointed, each of whom resides in a different geographic area of the state; and (5) [(6)] one or more individuals knowledgeable in child care services or the need of working individuals for child care services. (c) The committee shall advise the commission on the: (1) location, size, and design of the child care facilities; and (2) curriculum a child care facility must provide to ensure the provision of developmentally appropriate services of a high quality. (d) The committee is abolished and this section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *