Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3547 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Alvarado (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 3547
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to enforcement by a local government of fire safety
 standards at certain child-care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.04431 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.04431.  ENFORCEMENT OF STATE LAW BY COUNTY OR
 MUNICIPALITY. (a)  A municipality or a county may enforce state
 law and rules adopted under state law concerning fire safety
 standards at a licensed group day-care home or a registered family
 home.
 (b)  A municipality or county shall report to the department
 any violation of fire safety standards observed by the municipality
 or county at a licensed group day-care home or registered family
 home.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *