Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3570 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 3570
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to insurance coverage requirements for certain amusement
 rides.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2151.101(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may not operate an amusement ride unless the
 person:
 (1)  has had the amusement ride inspected at least once
 a year by an insurer or a person with whom the insurer has
 contracted;
 (2)  obtains a written certificate from the insurer or
 person with whom the insurer has contracted stating that the
 amusement ride:
 (A)  has been inspected;
 (B)  meets the standards for insurance coverage;
 and
 (C)  is covered by the insurance required by
 Subdivision (3);
 (3)  except as provided by Sections [Section] 2151.1011
 and 2151.1012, has a combined single limit or split limit insurance
 policy currently in effect written by an insurance company
 authorized to do business in this state or by a surplus lines
 insurer, as defined by Chapter 981, Insurance Code, or has an
 independently procured policy subject to Chapter 101, Insurance
 Code, insuring the owner or operator against liability for injury
 to persons arising out of the use of the amusement ride in an amount
 of not less than:
 (A)  for Class A amusement rides:
 (i)  $100,000 bodily injury and $50,000
 property damage per occurrence with a $300,000 annual aggregate; or
 (ii)  a $150,000 per occurrence combined
 single limit with a $300,000 annual aggregate; and
 (B)  for Class B amusement rides:
 (i)  $1,000,000 bodily injury and $500,000
 property damage per occurrence; or
 (ii)  $1,500,000 per occurrence combined
 single limit;
 (4)  files with the commissioner, as required by this
 chapter, the inspection certificate and the insurance policy or a
 photocopy of the certificate or policy authorized by the
 commissioner; and
 (5)  files with each sponsor, lessor, landowner, or
 other person responsible for the amusement ride being offered for
 use by the public a photocopy of the inspection certificate and the
 insurance policy required by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2151, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2151.1012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2151.1012.  LIABILITY INSURANCE FOR CERTAIN OTHER
 AMUSEMENT RIDES. (a)  This section applies only to a Class B
 amusement ride that:
 (1)  is mechanically inflated using a continuous
 airflow device; and
 (2)  provides a surface for bouncing and jumping or
 creates an enclosed space for the purpose of amusement.
 (b)  A person may not operate an amusement ride described by
 Subsection (a) unless the person has a combined single limit
 insurance policy currently in effect written by an insurance
 company authorized to conduct business in this state or by a surplus
 lines insurer, as defined by Chapter 981, Insurance Code, or has an
 independently procured policy subject to Chapter 101, Insurance
 Code, insuring the owner or operator against liability arising out
 of the use of the amusement ride in an amount of not less than $1
 million per occurrence.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *