Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3577 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3577


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility requirements for the Texas Educational
 Opportunity Grant.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.404(e), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  A person may not receive a grant under this subchapter
 and [if the person is eligible for] a TEXAS grant under Subchapter M
 for the same semester or other term, regardless of whether the
 person is otherwise eligible for both grants during that semester
 or term. A person who but for this subsection would be awarded both
 a grant under this subchapter and a TEXAS grant for the same
 semester or other term is entitled to receive only the grant of the
 greater amount.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act relating to
 the eligibility of a student for a Texas Educational Opportunity
 Grant applies beginning with grants awarded for the 2011-2012
 academic year. Grants awarded for an academic year before the
 2011-2012 academic year are governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3577 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3577 on May 23, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3577 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3577 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3577 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0
 .
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor