Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB360 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson, Isaac (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 360
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 16, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 16, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 360 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to ballot language for a proposition to approve the
 imposition, increase, or reduction of a tax or the issuance of
 bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.072, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  In addition to any other requirement imposed by law for
 a proposition, including a provision prescribing the proposition
 language, a proposition submitted to the voters for approval of the
 issuance of bonds or the imposition, increase, or reduction of a tax
 shall specifically state, as applicable:
 (1)  with respect to a proposition seeking voter
 approval of the issuance of bonds:
 (A)  the total principal amount of the bonds to be
 authorized, if approved; and
 (B)  a general description of the purposes for
 which the bonds are to be authorized, if approved;
 (2)  with respect to a proposition that only seeks
 voter approval of the imposition or increase of a tax, the amount of
 or maximum tax rate of the tax or tax increase for which approval is
 sought; or
 (3)  with respect to a proposition that only seeks
 voter approval of the reduction of a tax, the amount of tax rate
 reduction or the tax rate for which approval is sought.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an election ordered on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An election ordered before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the election was ordered.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *