Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3611 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION   Revision 1         May 4, 2011      TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3611 by Truitt (Relating to the administration of medication for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Human Resouces Code relating to the administration of medications for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.Section 2, Subsection (a) of the bill would direct the Texas Board of Nursing (BON) and the Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS) to conduct a pilot program to evaluate License Vocational Nurses (LVN) providing on-call services by telephone to clients (as defined in 161.091, Human Resources Code), who are under the care of LVNs. Under the provisions of the bill, the LVNs must use standardized and validated protocols or decision trees in performing the telephone services.  DADS would be required to collect data to evaluate the efficacy of the pilot program. The bill would require that the program must begin no later than 9/1/2011 and end on 8/31/2012.   Subsection (b) would require the BON and DADS to take certain actions related to the pilot program in consultation with stakeholders (both before and after the program).   Subsection (c) would require the BON and DADS, not later than 12/1/2012, to submit a report detailing the findings of the pilot program and any joint recommendations to certain committees of the House and Senate.  Subsection (d) of provides that Section 2 would expire on 9/1/2013. Based on the analysis of the Texas Board of Nursing and the Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services, it is assumed that duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in each house.  If the bill does not receive a two-thirds vote in each house, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:507 Texas Board of Nursing, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MW, CWS    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
Revision 1
May 4, 2011

Revision 1

Revision 1

  TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3611 by Truitt (Relating to the administration of medication for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3611 by Truitt (Relating to the administration of medication for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3611 by Truitt (Relating to the administration of medication for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB3611 by Truitt (Relating to the administration of medication for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Human Resouces Code relating to the administration of medications for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.Section 2, Subsection (a) of the bill would direct the Texas Board of Nursing (BON) and the Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS) to conduct a pilot program to evaluate License Vocational Nurses (LVN) providing on-call services by telephone to clients (as defined in 161.091, Human Resources Code), who are under the care of LVNs. Under the provisions of the bill, the LVNs must use standardized and validated protocols or decision trees in performing the telephone services.  DADS would be required to collect data to evaluate the efficacy of the pilot program. The bill would require that the program must begin no later than 9/1/2011 and end on 8/31/2012.   Subsection (b) would require the BON and DADS to take certain actions related to the pilot program in consultation with stakeholders (both before and after the program).   Subsection (c) would require the BON and DADS, not later than 12/1/2012, to submit a report detailing the findings of the pilot program and any joint recommendations to certain committees of the House and Senate.  Subsection (d) of provides that Section 2 would expire on 9/1/2013. Based on the analysis of the Texas Board of Nursing and the Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services, it is assumed that duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in each house.  If the bill does not receive a two-thirds vote in each house, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

The bill would amend the Human Resouces Code relating to the administration of medications for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.Section 2, Subsection (a) of the bill would direct the Texas Board of Nursing (BON) and the Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS) to conduct a pilot program to evaluate License Vocational Nurses (LVN) providing on-call services by telephone to clients (as defined in 161.091, Human Resources Code), who are under the care of LVNs. Under the provisions of the bill, the LVNs must use standardized and validated protocols or decision trees in performing the telephone services.  DADS would be required to collect data to evaluate the efficacy of the pilot program. The bill would require that the program must begin no later than 9/1/2011 and end on 8/31/2012.   Subsection (b) would require the BON and DADS to take certain actions related to the pilot program in consultation with stakeholders (both before and after the program).   Subsection (c) would require the BON and DADS, not later than 12/1/2012, to submit a report detailing the findings of the pilot program and any joint recommendations to certain committees of the House and Senate.  Subsection (d) of provides that Section 2 would expire on 9/1/2013.

Based on the analysis of the Texas Board of Nursing and the Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services, it is assumed that duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.

The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in each house.  If the bill does not receive a two-thirds vote in each house, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 507 Texas Board of Nursing, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

507 Texas Board of Nursing, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MW, CWS

 JOB, CL, MW, CWS