Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB479 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Orr (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 479
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location of board meetings of certain economic
 development corporations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.054, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.054.  LOCATION OF BOARD MEETINGS.  (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the [The] board of directors of a Type A
 corporation shall conduct each board meeting within the boundaries
 of the authorizing municipality.
 (b)  If the authorizing municipality is located in a county
 with a population of less than 30,000, the board of directors of a
 Type A corporation may conduct a board meeting within the
 boundaries of the county.
 SECTION 2.  Section 505.055, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 505.055.  LOCATION OF BOARD MEETINGS. (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the [The] board of directors of a Type B
 corporation shall conduct all meetings within the boundaries of the
 authorizing municipality.
 (b)  If the authorizing municipality is located in a county
 with a population of less than 30,000, the board of directors of a
 Type B corporation may conduct a board meeting within the
 boundaries of the county.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *