Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB550 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 550


 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption to the requirement for a fishing license
 for residents of a certain age.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 46.002(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A license issued under this chapter is not required of a
 person:
 (1)  who is a resident and whose birth date is before
 January 1, 1931 [September 1, 1930];
 (2)  who is a nonresident, if the person's birth date is
 before September 1, 1930, and the person's state of residence
 grants a similar age exemption to Texas residents;
 (3)  who is mentally disabled and who is engaging in
 recreational fishing as part of medically approved therapy, and who
 is fishing under the immediate supervision of personnel approved or
 employed by a hospital, residence, or school for mentally disabled
 persons;
 (4)  who is mentally retarded and is engaged in
 recreational fishing under the immediate supervision of a person
 who:
 (A)  holds a license issued under this chapter;
 and
 (B)  has the permission of the mentally retarded
 person's family head or legal guardian to take the mentally
 retarded person fishing if the person is not a member of the family
 of the mentally retarded person; or
 (5)  who is participating in an event that is sponsored
 or co-sponsored by the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department with the
 approval of the Executive Director.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 550 was passed by the House on May 13,
 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 7, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 550 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 550 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor