Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB550 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 20, 2011      TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB550 by Dutton ( Relating to an exemption to the requirement for a fishing license for residents of a certain age.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to provide that general fishing license fees for residents born prior to January 1, 1931 be waived. Currently fees are waived for residents born prior to September 1, 1930. Based on an analysis of licenses and stamps purchased by this population in fiscal year 2010, t he Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) estimates a revenue loss of $16,178 per fiscal year in the General Revenue-Dedicated Game, Fish and Water Safety Account No. 9 to result from passage of this legislation. Accordingly, to the extent the bills provisions would result in a minimal loss of revenue, no significant fiscal implication to TPWD or the state is anticipated. The bill would take immediate effect with a two-thirds vote of all members. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:802 Parks and Wildlife Department   LBB Staff:  JOB, TB, KM, ZS    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2011





  TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB550 by Dutton ( Relating to an exemption to the requirement for a fishing license for residents of a certain age.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB550 by Dutton ( Relating to an exemption to the requirement for a fishing license for residents of a certain age.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism 

 Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB550 by Dutton ( Relating to an exemption to the requirement for a fishing license for residents of a certain age.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB550 by Dutton ( Relating to an exemption to the requirement for a fishing license for residents of a certain age.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to provide that general fishing license fees for residents born prior to January 1, 1931 be waived. Currently fees are waived for residents born prior to September 1, 1930. Based on an analysis of licenses and stamps purchased by this population in fiscal year 2010, t he Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) estimates a revenue loss of $16,178 per fiscal year in the General Revenue-Dedicated Game, Fish and Water Safety Account No. 9 to result from passage of this legislation. Accordingly, to the extent the bills provisions would result in a minimal loss of revenue, no significant fiscal implication to TPWD or the state is anticipated. The bill would take immediate effect with a two-thirds vote of all members. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to provide that general fishing license fees for residents born prior to January 1, 1931 be waived. Currently fees are waived for residents born prior to September 1, 1930. Based on an analysis of licenses and stamps purchased by this population in fiscal year 2010, t he Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) estimates a revenue loss of $16,178 per fiscal year in the General Revenue-Dedicated Game, Fish and Water Safety Account No. 9 to result from passage of this legislation. Accordingly, to the extent the bills provisions would result in a minimal loss of revenue, no significant fiscal implication to TPWD or the state is anticipated. The bill would take immediate effect with a two-thirds vote of all members. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 802 Parks and Wildlife Department

802 Parks and Wildlife Department

LBB Staff: JOB, TB, KM, ZS

 JOB, TB, KM, ZS