Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB716 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Miller of Erath, Christian, Deshotel(Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 716
 (Senate Sponsor - Fraser)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2011;
 April 14, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 4, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 4, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 716 By:  Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the taking of certain feral hogs and coyotes using a
 helicopter.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 43, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 43.1075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.1075.  USING HELICOPTERS TO TAKE CERTAIN ANIMALS.  A
 qualified landowner or landowner's agent, as determined by
 commission rule, may contract to participate as a hunter or
 observer in using a helicopter to take depredating feral hogs or
 coyotes under the authority of a permit issued under this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Parks and Wildlife Commission shall adopt rules as
 necessary to implement Section 43.1075, Parks and Wildlife Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *