Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB753 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 753
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recruitment and retention of certain caseworkers
 employed by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 40.0327 and 40.0328 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 40.0327.  PREEMPLOYMENT ASSESSMENT; PREFERENCE.
 (a)  The department shall use special assessment tools in screening
 applicants for employment with the child protective services
 division in order to match an applicant with the position in the
 division for which an applicant would be best suited based on the
 applicant's skills, personality traits, and experience.
 (b)  The department shall give favorable consideration to an
 applicant for an entry-level caseworker position who has a master's
 degree or bachelor's degree in social work over other applicants
 who have comparable skills.
 Sec. 40.0328.  SALARY STUDY. (a) The department shall study
 the salaries of each type of child protective services caseworker
 to determine the role salary plays in the recruitment and retention
 of caseworkers and in the turnover rate for each type of caseworker.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2012, the department shall
 report the results of the study and any recommendations to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and standing committee of each house of the
 legislature with jurisdiction over the department.
 (c)  The commission shall consider contracting with an
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, to perform the study required by this section.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *