Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB805 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R845 JXC-F
 By: Callegari H.B. No. 805


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain water service providers
 ensure emergency operations during an extended power outage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.1395(a)(1), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Affected utility" means a retail public utility,
 exempt utility, or provider or conveyor of potable or raw water
 service that furnishes water service to more than one customer:
 (A)  in a county with a population of 3.3 million
 or more; or
 (B)  in a county with a population of 350,000
 [400,000] or more adjacent to a county with a population of 3.3
 million or more.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than November 1, 2011, each
 affected utility described by Section 13.1395(a)(1)(B), Water
 Code, as amended by this Act, shall submit the information required
 by Section 13.1396, Water Code, to:
 (1)  each appropriate county judge and office of
 emergency management;
 (2)  the Public Utility Commission of Texas; and
 (3)  the division of emergency management of the
 governor.
 (b)  Not later than February 1, 2012, each affected utility
 described by Section 13.1395(a)(1)(B), Water Code, as amended by
 this Act, shall submit to the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality the emergency preparedness plan required by Section
 13.1395, Water Code, as amended by this Act.
 (c)  Not later than June 1, 2012, each affected utility
 described by Section 13.1395(a)(1)(B), Water Code, as amended by
 this Act, shall implement the emergency preparedness plan approved
 by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality under Section
 13.1395, Water Code, as amended by this Act.
 (d)  An affected utility described by Section
 13.1395(a)(1)(B), Water Code, as amended by this Act, may file with
 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality a written request for
 an extension, not to exceed 90 days, of the date by which the
 affected utility is required under Subsection (b) of this section
 to submit the affected utility's emergency preparedness plan or of
 the date by which the affected utility is required under Subsection
 (c) of this section to implement the affected utility's emergency
 preparedness plan. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall approve the requested extension for good cause shown.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.