H.B. No. 871 AN ACT relating to indigent health care services that may be provided by a county. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 61.0285(a), Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) In addition to basic health care services provided under Section 61.028, a county may, in accordance with department rules adopted under Section 61.006, provide other medically necessary services or supplies that the county determines to be cost-effective, including: (1) ambulatory surgical center services; (2) diabetic and colostomy medical supplies and equipment; (3) durable medical equipment; (4) home and community health care services; (5) social work services; (6) psychological counseling services; (7) services provided by physician assistants, nurse practitioners, certified nurse midwives, clinical nurse specialists, and certified registered nurse anesthetists; (8) dental care; (9) vision care, including eyeglasses; (10) services provided by federally qualified health centers, as defined by 42 U.S.C. Section 1396d(l)(2)(B); (11) emergency medical services; [and] (12) physical and occupational therapy services; and (13) any other appropriate health care service identified by department [board] rule that may be determined to be cost-effective. SECTION 2. The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 61.0285, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, as soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 871 was passed by the House on April 7, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 3, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 871 on May 24, 2011, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 871 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 79, Nays 68, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 871 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 18, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 871 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor