Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB871 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis of Dallas (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 871
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to indigent health care services that may be provided by a
 county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0285(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to basic health care services provided under
 Section 61.028, a county may, in accordance with department rules
 adopted under Section 61.006, provide other medically necessary
 services or supplies that the county determines to be
 cost-effective, including:
 (1)  ambulatory surgical center services;
 (2)  diabetic and colostomy medical supplies and
 equipment;
 (3)  durable medical equipment;
 (4)  home and community health care services;
 (5)  social work services;
 (6)  psychological counseling services;
 (7)  services provided by physician assistants, nurse
 practitioners, certified nurse midwives, clinical nurse
 specialists, and certified registered nurse anesthetists;
 (8)  dental care;
 (9)  vision care, including eyeglasses;
 (10)  services provided by federally qualified health
 centers, as defined by 42 U.S.C. Section 1396d(l)(2)(B);
 (11)  emergency medical services; [and]
 (12)  physical and occupational therapy services; and
 (13)  any other appropriate health care service
 identified by department [board] rule that may be determined to be
 cost-effective.
 SECTION 2.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 61.0285, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, as
 soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *