Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB90 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Cook (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 90
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 21, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility to obtain a driver's license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as Aaron's Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.201, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.201.  LICENSE INELIGIBILITY IN GENERAL.  (a) The
 department may not issue any license to a person who:
 (1)  is under 15 years of age;
 (2)  is under 18 years of age unless the person complies
 with the requirements imposed by Section 521.204;
 (3)  is shown to be addicted to the use of alcohol, a
 controlled substance, or another drug that renders a person
 incapable of driving;
 (4)  holds a driver's license issued by this state or
 another state or country that is revoked, canceled, or under
 suspension;
 (5)  has been determined by a judgment of a court to be
 totally incapacitated or incapacitated to act as the operator of a
 motor vehicle unless the person has, by the date of the license
 application, been:
 (A)  restored to capacity by judicial decree; or
 (B)  released from a hospital for the mentally
 incapacitated on a certificate by the superintendent or
 administrator of the hospital that the person has regained
 capacity;
 (6)  the department determines to be afflicted with a
 mental or physical disability or disease that prevents the person
 from exercising reasonable and ordinary control over a motor
 vehicle while operating the vehicle on a highway, except that a
 person may not be refused a license because of a physical defect if
 common experience shows that the defect does not incapacitate a
 person from safely operating a motor vehicle;
 (7)  has been reported by a court under Section
 521.3452 for failure to appear unless the court has filed an
 additional report on final disposition of the case; [or]
 (8)  has been reported by a court for failure to appear
 or default in payment of a fine for a misdemeanor that is not
 covered under Subdivision (7) and that is punishable by a fine only,
 including a misdemeanor under a municipal ordinance, committed by a
 person who was under 17 years of age at the time of the alleged
 offense, unless the court has filed an additional report on final
 disposition of the case; or
 (9)  except as provided by Section 521.207, is younger
 than 24 years of age and:
 (A)  has not obtained a high school diploma or its
 equivalent; or
 (B)  is a student:
 (i)  enrolled in a public school or private
 school, including a home school, who attended school for at least 80
 days in the fall or spring semester preceding the date of the
 driver's license application; or
 (ii)  who has been enrolled for at least 45
 days, and is enrolled as of the date of the application, in a
 program to prepare persons to pass the high school equivalency
 exam.
 (b)  Subsection (a)(9) does not apply to the renewal of a
 license issued before January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter J, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.207 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.207.  RESTRICTIONS ON CERTAIN PERSONS WITHOUT HIGH
 SCHOOL DIPLOMA OR EQUIVALENT. (a) The department may issue a
 restricted license to an applicant who is younger than 24 years of
 age and who has not obtained a high school diploma or its equivalent
 that allows the holder to travel between the holder's residence and
 another place for the purpose of:
 (1)  school;
 (2)  work;
 (3)  any school-sponsored educational or athletic
 activity;
 (4)  any non-school-sponsored community service or
 volunteer activity;
 (5)  religious services;
 (6)  essential household duties, including obtaining
 child care; and
 (7)  obtaining emergency medical care.
 (b)  The department shall adopt rules to implement this
 section, including:
 (1)  defining types of acceptable documentation of
 obtaining a high school diploma or its equivalent, including
 documentation from the applicant's parent or a person standing in
 parental relation; and
 (2)  designing a license with a marking to indicate the
 restricted status described by this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 521.223, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (b), (c), and (f) and adding Subsections
 (b-1) and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  An applicant for a license under Subsection (a) must be
 15 years and 180 days of age or older and must:
 (1)  except as provided by Subsection (b-1), have
 passed a driver education course approved by the department, which
 may be a course approved under Section 521.205; and
 (2)  pass the examination required by Section 521.161.
 (b-1)  An applicant for a license to operate a farm vehicle
 under Subsection (a) must have passed a driver education course
 approved by the department, which may be a course approved under
 Section 521.205.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), to [To] be
 eligible to take the driver education [training] course under
 Subsection (b)(1), the person must be at least 15 [14] years of age.
 (c-1)  To be eligible to take the driver training course to
 obtain a license to operate a farm vehicle, the person must be at
 least 14 years of age.
 (f)  In the manner provided by Subchapter N, the department
 shall [may] suspend a license issued under this section if the
 holder of the license is convicted of a moving violation.
 SECTION 5.  Section 521.223(d), Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the issuance of a hardship license on or after the effective date
 of this Act.  The issuance of a hardship license before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *