Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB971 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Parker, Geren, Hilderbran H.B. No. 971
 (Senate Sponsor - Fraser)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 21, 2011, reported favorably, as amended, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By:  Jackson
 Amend H.B. 971 as follows:
 (1)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in the introductory language
 (page 1, line 34), between "(c)" and "to" insert "and Subsection
 (d)".
 (2)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 37.053,
 Utilities Code (page 1, between lines 37 and 38), insert the
 following:
 (d)  For transmission facilities ordered or approved by the
 commission under Chapters 37 or 39 to mitigate market power in
 accordance with Section 39.157(a), address reliability needs, or to
 otherwise ensure the competitiveness of electricity markets in this
 state, the rights extended to an electric corporation under Section
 181.004 extend to all public and private land on which the
 commission has approved the construction of the line.  This
 subsection does not limit a municipality's rights or an electric
 utility's obligations under Chapter 33.
 (3)  In SECTION 3 of the bill (page 1, line 41), strike "This
 Act" and substitute "The change in law made by this Act to Section
 37.053(c), Utilities Code,".
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to removal of the requirement that an electric utility
 designate a preferred route for a transmission line in an
 application for a certificate of convenience and necessity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.053, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission may not require the applicant to
 designate a preferred route for a proposed transmission line
 facility.
 SECTION 2.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 adopt or revise rules under Section 37.053, Utilities Code, as
 amended by this Act, before June 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to an application for a
 certificate of convenience and necessity that is filed with the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas on or after the effective date of
 this Act. An application for a certificate of convenience and
 necessity that was filed with the commission before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 application was filed, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *