Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB973 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 14, 2011      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB973 by Kleinschmidt (Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into, served in, or volunteered for federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB973, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($49,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 14, 2011





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB973 by Kleinschmidt (Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into, served in, or volunteered for federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB973 by Kleinschmidt (Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into, served in, or volunteered for federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB973 by Kleinschmidt (Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into, served in, or volunteered for federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), As Introduced

HB973 by Kleinschmidt (Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into, served in, or volunteered for federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB973, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($49,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB973, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($49,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($42,000)   2013 ($7,000)   2014 ($5,005)   2015 ($3,000)   2016 ($998)    


2012 ($42,000)
2013 ($7,000)
2014 ($5,005)
2015 ($3,000)
2016 ($998)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 ($42,000)   2013 ($7,000)   2014 ($5,005)   2015 ($3,000)   2016 ($998)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 ($42,000)   2013 ($7,000)   2014 ($5,005)   2015 ($3,000)   2016 ($998)  


2012 ($42,000)
2013 ($7,000)
2014 ($5,005)
2015 ($3,000)
2016 ($998)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Government Code, adding Section 431.134 (a) (13) and (14) to include the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal and the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal awarded to persons who were inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard.The bill would add the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty. To be eligible a person would have been on federal active duty after March 19, 2003 in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom, or on federal active duty after August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New Dawn.  The bill would also add the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty.The Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house.  If the Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.

Methodology

 The estimated cost per medal is $3.50. The Adjutant Generals Department estimates a total of 12,000 members of the Texas National Guard are currently eligible to receive the campaign medals at a cost of $42,000 ($3.50 X 12,000), and that 2,000 members may be awarded in fiscal year 2013 at a cost of $7,000 ($3.50 X 2,000), 1,430 in fiscal year 2014 at a cost of $5,005 ($3.50 X 1,430), 857 in fiscal year 2015 at a cost of $3,000 ($3.5 X 857), and 285 medals awarded in 2016 at a cost of $998 ($3.50 X 285).

The estimated cost per medal is $3.50. The Adjutant Generals Department estimates a total of 12,000 members of the Texas National Guard are currently eligible to receive the campaign medals at a cost of $42,000 ($3.50 X 12,000), and that 2,000 members may be awarded in fiscal year 2013 at a cost of $7,000 ($3.50 X 2,000), 1,430 in fiscal year 2014 at a cost of $5,005 ($3.50 X 1,430), 857 in fiscal year 2015 at a cost of $3,000 ($3.5 X 857), and 285 medals awarded in 2016 at a cost of $998 ($3.50 X 285).

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 401 Adjutant General's Department

401 Adjutant General's Department

LBB Staff: JOB, KM, GG, DAR

 JOB, KM, GG, DAR