LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 4, 2011 TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB973 by Kleinschmidt ( Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into or served in federal military service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB973, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($49,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 4, 2011 TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB973 by Kleinschmidt ( Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into or served in federal military service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB973 by Kleinschmidt ( Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into or served in federal military service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Defense & Veterans' Affairs John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board HB973 by Kleinschmidt ( Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into or served in federal military service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted HB973 by Kleinschmidt ( Relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces who were inducted into or served in federal military service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB973, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($49,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB973, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($49,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds 2012 ($42,000) 2013 ($7,000) 2014 ($5,005) 2015 ($3,000) 2016 ($998) 2012 ($42,000) 2013 ($7,000) 2014 ($5,005) 2015 ($3,000) 2016 ($998) All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 2012 ($42,000) 2013 ($7,000) 2014 ($5,005) 2015 ($3,000) 2016 ($998) Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 2012 ($42,000) 2013 ($7,000) 2014 ($5,005) 2015 ($3,000) 2016 ($998) 2012 ($42,000) 2013 ($7,000) 2014 ($5,005) 2015 ($3,000) 2016 ($998) Fiscal Analysis The bill would amend Government Code, adding Section 431.134 (a) (13) and (14) to include the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal and the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal awarded to persons who were inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard.The bill would add the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty. To be eligible a person would have been on federal active duty after March 19, 2003 in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom, or on federal active duty after August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New Dawn. The bill would also add the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty.The Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house. If the Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. Methodology The estimated cost per medal is $3.50. The Adjutant Generals Department estimates a total of 12,000 members of the Texas National Guard are currently eligible to receive the campaign medals at a cost of $42,000 ($3.50 X 12,000), and that 2,000 members may be awarded in fiscal year 2013 at a cost of $7,000 ($3.50 X 2,000), 1,430 in fiscal year 2014 at a cost of $5,005 ($3.50 X 1,430), 857 in fiscal year 2015 at a cost of $3,000 ($3.5 X 857), and 285 medals awarded in 2016 at a cost of $998 ($3.50 X 285). The estimated cost per medal is $3.50. The Adjutant Generals Department estimates a total of 12,000 members of the Texas National Guard are currently eligible to receive the campaign medals at a cost of $42,000 ($3.50 X 12,000), and that 2,000 members may be awarded in fiscal year 2013 at a cost of $7,000 ($3.50 X 2,000), 1,430 in fiscal year 2014 at a cost of $5,005 ($3.50 X 1,430), 857 in fiscal year 2015 at a cost of $3,000 ($3.5 X 857), and 285 medals awarded in 2016 at a cost of $998 ($3.50 X 285). Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies: 401 Adjutant General's Department 401 Adjutant General's Department LBB Staff: JOB, KM, GG, DAR JOB, KM, GG, DAR