Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR15 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R10244 KLA-D
 By: Rodriguez H.J.R. No. 15


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment increasing the rates of taxes
 imposed on gasoline and diesel fuel, adjusting those rates annually
 for inflation, and dedicating certain revenue from those taxes to
 the design, construction, and maintenance of public roadways.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section and subject [Subject] to legislative appropriation,
 allocation and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and road
 district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939,
 and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of
 the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law;
 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
 and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 (b)  The net revenue from the portions of the rates of the
 taxes imposed on gasoline and diesel fuel used to propel motor
 vehicles over public roadways that exceed the rates of those taxes
 in effect on January 1, 2011, shall be used for the sole purpose of
 designing, constructing, and maintaining public roadways.
 SECTION 2.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, the state shall impose the taxes authorized by Chapter
 162, Tax Code, or its successor, on gasoline and diesel fuel at the
 rate of 30 cents for each net gallon or fractional part on which the
 taxes are imposed.
 (b)  Beginning August 1, 2020, and not later than August 1 of
 each subsequent year, the comptroller shall revise the rates of the
 taxes authorized by Chapter 162, Tax Code, or its successor, on
 gasoline and diesel fuel in effect on August 1 by applying a
 percentage change to the rates equal to the percentage representing
 the most recent annual change in the consumer price index for all
 urban consumers for all items and for all regions of the United
 States combined, as determined by the United States Department of
 Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics. If that index is discontinued or
 superseded, the comptroller shall use a similar index selected or
 calculated by the comptroller. A revised tax rate takes effect on
 the following September 1.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, the
 legislature by general law may raise the rate of the tax to a rate
 higher than the rate prescribed by that subsection or modify or
 repeal the tax.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, but
 subject to Subsection (c) of this section, the state shall impose
 the taxes authorized by Chapter 162, Tax Code, or its successor, on
 gasoline and diesel fuel at the following rates for each net gallon
 or fractional part on which taxes are imposed:
 (1)  beginning January 1, 2012, 22 cents;
 (2)  beginning September 1, 2013, 24 cents;
 (3)  beginning September 1, 2015, 26 cents; and
 (4)  beginning September 1, 2017, 28 cents.
 (e)  This subsection and Subsection (d) of this section
 expire September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2011.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment increasing the rates of
 taxes imposed on gasoline and diesel fuel, adjusting those rates
 annually for inflation, and dedicating certain revenue from those
 taxes to the design, construction, and maintenance of public
 roadways."