Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR151 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R12496 YDB-F
 By: Thompson H.J.R. No. 151


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the operation of
 casino games in this state by federally recognized Indian tribes on
 certain land.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 47, Article III, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Legislature shall pass laws prohibiting lotteries
 and gift enterprises in this State other than those authorized by
 Subsections (b), (d), and (e) of this section and by Section 47a of
 this article.
 SECTION 2.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 47a to read as follows:
 Sec. 47a.  (a)  The legislature by general law in accordance
 with this section shall authorize the operation of casino gaming in
 this state in which individuals for consideration play games of
 chance that award prizes and are operated by persons licensed or
 otherwise authorized by this state to conduct casino gaming.  The
 law must:
 (1)  limit casino gaming operations in this state to
 gaming operated by federally recognized Indian tribes operating
 under state law or under a compact with this state in the form
 prescribed by general law or negotiated by the secretary of state,
 on land held in trust by the United States for such tribes on
 January 1, 2011, or land acquired by the tribes that is not more
 than five miles from the border of the land held in trust by the
 tribes on January 1, 2011, and designated by the applicable tribe
 for casino gaming operations;
 (2)  provide for the regulation of all casino gaming by
 agencies of this state and the Indian tribes;
 (3)  provide:
 (A)  a comprehensive certification or licensing
 program, including necessary background investigations, to govern
 a person that manages casino gaming operations in this state or that
 maintains, manufactures, distributes, sells, or leases casino
 games for use or play in this state;
 (B)  procedures for the state agency responsible
 for conducting criminal background investigations for the state to
 provide criminal background information to the state and tribal
 agencies responsible for certification or licensing under
 Paragraph (A) of this subdivision; and
 (C)  procedures for the monitoring and inspection
 of casino gaming operations as necessary to protect the public
 health, welfare, and safety, to preserve the integrity of this
 state, the Indian tribes, and gaming operations in the state, and to
 prevent financial loss to this state and the tribes;
 (4)  prohibit and impose criminal penalties for the
 possession and operation of all gaming devices other than devices
 operated in connection with authorized casino gaming operations or
 gaming devices otherwise authorized by state law; and
 (5)  provide that not less than eight percent of the
 gross gaming revenue generated from casino gaming operated by an
 Indian tribe shall be transferred to this state in accordance with
 the conditions set forth in the compact authorizing the tribe to
 operate casino gaming operations or as provided by general law.
 (b)  In the absence of enabling legislation to implement
 Subsection (a) of this section, the authority of this state to
 operate lotteries under Section 47(e) of this article includes the
 authority of the state agency that operates state lotteries to
 adopt rules to implement casino gaming operations in accordance
 with Subsection (a) of this section, and the state agency shall
 adopt rules to implement casino gaming operations in accordance
 with Subsection (a) of this section.
 (c)  The legislature may authorize a portion of the revenue
 received by this state from the operation of casino gaming under
 this section to be distributed to counties and municipalities
 impacted by those activities.
 (d)  All shipments of casino gaming equipment or other gaming
 devices into, out of, or within this state authorized under this
 section or a law enacted under this section are legal shipments of
 the devices and are exempt from the provisions of 15 U.S.C. Sections
 1171-1178 prohibiting the transportation of gambling devices.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, authorizing the operation of casino games in
 this state by federally recognized Indian tribes on certain land.
 (b)  Not later than December 15, 2011, the executive director
 of the Texas Lottery Commission shall appoint an Indian Gaming
 Advisory Committee to assist the Texas Lottery Commission with
 implementing Section 47a, Article III, of this constitution. The
 advisory committee must include the following:
 (1)  one member with understanding and experience
 working in the Indian gaming industry;
 (2)  one member with experience and knowledge in Indian
 gaming regulation;
 (3)  three members to represent the federally
 recognized Indian tribes in this state, one from each tribe; and
 (4)  other members the executive director considers
 necessary.
 (c)  Not later than December 31, 2011, the Texas Lottery
 Commission shall adopt the rules, including any emergency rules,
 necessary to implement Section 47a, Article III, of this
 constitution.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2011.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 operation of casino games in this state by federally recognized
 Indian tribes on certain land."