Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR1265 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R18232 RYA-D
 By: Gallego H.R. No. 1265


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Second Lieutenant Jacob A. Fernandez has displayed
 exceptional valor while serving his country with the U.S. Marine
 Corps, and he is truly worthy of special recognition; and
 WHEREAS, Born on August 13, 1984, to Midiam M. Flores and
 Ralph Anthony Fernandez, Jacob Fernandez graduated from Del Rio
 High School in 2002; determined to serve his nation after the
 terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, this patriotic young man
 enlisted in the marines and reported for recruit training in August
 2002; following boot camp, he completed the 52-day Infantry
 Training Battalion course at the School of Infantry at Camp
 Pendleton, California; and
 WHEREAS, Jacob Fernandez then deployed to Iraq with Kilo
 Company, 3rd Battalion, 5th Marine Regiment, as part of Operation
 Iraqi Freedom; he subsequently returned to Iraq with the 3/5 for two
 more combat tours and saw action in the battle for Fallujah; and
 WHEREAS, This outstanding Texan also continued his military
 training, completing the Infantry Squad Leader Course, in which he
 received the Gung Ho Award, and the Infantry Platoon Sergeants
 Course; motivated by his desire to pursue a career as a Marine Corps
 officer, Jacob Fernandez applied to the Marine Corps Enlisted
 Commissioning Educational Program and was accepted in the fall of
 2006; after completing the preparatory course at San Diego, he
 enrolled at The University of Texas at Austin, where he majored in
 geography and participated in the Naval Reserve Officer Training
 Corps program; during the summer of his freshman year at UT, he
 attended Officer Candidate School at Quantico, Virginia, where he
 finished in the top 10 percent of his class; he earned his bachelor
 of arts degree on December 15, 2010, and received his commission as
 a second lieutenant in the U.S. Marine Corps on March 25, 2011; On
 June 7, 2011, he reports to The Basic School in Quantico, Virginia,
 to continue his training as an officer; and
 WHEREAS, Among the many decorations and awards conferred on
 Second Lieutenant Fernandez by the marines are the Purple Heart,
 four Navy and Marine Corps Achievement Medals, including two with
 the Combat Distinguishing Device for Valor, a Combat Action Ribbon,
 the Presidential Unit Citation, two Navy Unit Citations, and two
 Good Conduct Medals; moreover, he is the recipient of the National
 Defense Service Medal, two Iraq Campaign Medals, the Global War on
 Terrorism Medal, the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary Medal,
 and three Sea Service Deployment Ribbons; and
 WHEREAS, Second Lieutenant Jacob Fernandez embodies the
 Marine Corps values of honor, courage, and commitment, and he has
 earned the lasting respect and gratitude of all Americans; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature hereby honor Second Lieutenant Jacob A. Fernandez for
 his service with the United States Marine Corps and extend to him
 sincere best wishes for continued success in all his endeavors;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Second Lieutenant Fernandez as an expression of high
 regard by the Texas House of Representatives.