82R32078 MXM-F By: Cook H.R. No. 2571 R E S O L U T I O N BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the State of Texas, 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, That House Rule 13, Section 9(a), be suspended in part as provided by House Rule 13, Section 9(f), to enable the conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on House Bill 2499 (continuation and functions of the Department of Information Resources and the transfer of certain department functions to the comptroller of public accounts), to consider and take action on the following matter: House Rule 13, Section 9(a)(4), is suspended to permit the committee to add text on a matter which is not included in either the house or senate version of the bill by adding the following sections to the bill: SECTION 25. Subchapter A, Chapter 2157, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2157.0013 to read as follows: Sec. 2157.0013. SUNSET PROVISION. (a) The transfer of powers and duties to the comptroller under Section 2157.068 and under House Bill 2499, Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). (b) The Sunset Advisory Commission shall evaluate the transfer of powers and duties to the comptroller under Section 2157.068 and under House Bill 2499, Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, and present to the 84th Legislature a report on its evaluation and recommendations in relation to the transfer. The comptroller shall perform all duties in relation to the evaluation that a state agency subject to review under Chapter 325 would perform in relation to a review. (c) This section expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 39. (a) The comptroller shall submit, on the dates prescribed by Subsection (c) of this section, a report regarding the transfer described by Section 37 of this Act to the following: (1) the Legislative Budget Board; (2) the speaker of the house of representatives; (3) the lieutenant governor; and (4) the chairs of the house and senate committees with primary oversight over the comptroller's purchasing functions. (b) The report must analyze the efficiency and implementation of the transfer described by Section 37 of this Act. (c) Each report described by this section is due not later than: (1) March 1, 2012; (2) September 1, 2012; (3) September 1, 2013; and (4) September 1, 2014. Explanation: This change is necessary to require sunset review of, and a report on, the transfer of certain purchasing functions to the comptroller.