Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR2571 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2571


 R E S O L U T I O N
 BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the State of
 Texas, 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, That House Rule 13,
 Section 9(a), be suspended in part as provided by House Rule 13,
 Section 9(f), to enable the conference committee appointed to
 resolve the differences on House Bill 2499 (continuation and
 functions of the Department of Information Resources and the
 transfer of certain department functions to the comptroller of
 public accounts), to consider and take action on the following
 matter:
 House Rule 13, Section 9(a)(4), is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter which is not included in either
 the house or senate version of the bill by adding the following
 sections to the bill:
 SECTION 25.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2157, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2157.0013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2157.0013.  SUNSET PROVISION. (a) The transfer of
 powers and duties to the comptroller under Section 2157.068 and
 under House Bill 2499, Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).
 (b)  The Sunset Advisory Commission shall evaluate the
 transfer of powers and duties to the comptroller under Section
 2157.068 and under House Bill 2499, Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, and present to the 84th Legislature a report
 on its evaluation and recommendations in relation to the transfer.
 The comptroller shall perform all duties in relation to the
 evaluation that a state agency subject to review under Chapter 325
 would perform in relation to a review.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 39.  (a)  The comptroller shall submit, on the dates
 prescribed by Subsection (c) of this section, a report regarding
 the transfer described by Section 37 of this Act to the following:
 (1)  the Legislative Budget Board;
 (2)  the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (3)  the lieutenant governor; and
 (4)  the chairs of the house and senate committees with
 primary oversight over the comptroller's purchasing functions.
 (b)  The report must analyze the efficiency and
 implementation of the transfer described by Section 37 of this Act.
 (c)  Each report described by this section is due not later
 than:
 (1)  March 1, 2012;
 (2)  September 1, 2012;
 (3)  September 1, 2013; and
 (4)  September 1, 2014.
 Explanation:  This change is necessary to require sunset
 review of, and a report on, the transfer of certain purchasing
 functions to the comptroller.
 Cook
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2571 was adopted by the House on May
 28, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 2, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House