Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1017 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis, Harris, Nelson S.B. No. 1017
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; March 28, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 28, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1017 By:  Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain comprehensive development agreements of the
 Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2011.  LIMITED AUTHORITY FOR CERTAIN PROJECTS USING
 COMPREHENSIVE DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. Notwithstanding Sections
 223.201(f) and (i), the department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement relating to the following segments of the
 North Tarrant Express Project:
 (1)  on State Highway 183 from State Highway 121 to
 State Highway 161 (Segment 2E);
 (2)  on Interstate Highway 35W from Interstate Highway
 30 to State Highway 114 (Segments 3A, 3B, and 3C); and
 (3)  on Interstate Highway 820 from State Highway 183
 North to south of Randol Mill Road (Segment 4).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *