Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1033 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1033     82R6081 DRH-D   By: Seliger         State Affairs         3/23/2011         As Filed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1033
82R6081 DRH-D By: Seliger
 State Affairs
 3/23/2011
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 1033

82R6081 DRH-D

By: Seliger

 

State Affairs

 

3/23/2011

 

As Filed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Current law permits municipalities and certain other political subdivisions to move their elections to align with the November general election. H.B. 401, 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, changed the deadline for a governing body to move its election from December 31, 2005, to December 31, 2010.   S.B. 1033 extends that deadline again to December 31, 2012, to give additional political subdivisions the opportunity to align their elections with the November general election.    As proposed, S.B. 1033 amends current law relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.    SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Sections 41.0052(a) and (a-1), Election Code, as follows:   (a) Redesignates existing Subsection (a-1) as Subsection (a). Authorizes the governing body of a political subdivision, other than a county, that holds its general election for officers on a date other than the November uniform election date to, not later than December 31, 2012, rather than December 31, 2010, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the November uniform election date.   Deletes existing Subsection (a) authorizing the governing body of a political subdivision other than a county to, not later than December 31, 2005, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2011.   

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Current law permits municipalities and certain other political subdivisions to move their elections to align with the November general election. H.B. 401, 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, changed the deadline for a governing body to move its election from December 31, 2005, to December 31, 2010.

 

S.B. 1033 extends that deadline again to December 31, 2012, to give additional political subdivisions the opportunity to align their elections with the November general election. 

 

As proposed, S.B. 1033 amends current law relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. 

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Sections 41.0052(a) and (a-1), Election Code, as follows:

 

(a) Redesignates existing Subsection (a-1) as Subsection (a). Authorizes the governing body of a political subdivision, other than a county, that holds its general election for officers on a date other than the November uniform election date to, not later than December 31, 2012, rather than December 31, 2010, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the November uniform election date.

 

Deletes existing Subsection (a) authorizing the governing body of a political subdivision other than a county to, not later than December 31, 2005, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2011.