Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1042 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1042
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 4, 2011,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 4, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of employees convicted of certain
 offenses to provide services under a contract with a public school.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (o), Section 22.0834, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (o)  A contracting or subcontracting entity may not permit an
 employee to whom Subsection (a) applies to provide services at a
 school if the employee has been convicted of a felony or misdemeanor
 offense that would prevent a person from being employed [obtaining
 certification as an educator] under Section 22.085(a) [21.060].
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (o), Section 22.0834, Education Code,
 as amended by this Act, applies to the provision of services at a
 public school by an employee of a contracting or subcontracting
 entity without regard to whether the contract or subcontract under
 which the person is employed was entered into before, on, or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *