Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1043 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1043
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criminal penalty for the discarding of certain
 burning materials.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 365.012, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 365.012.  ILLEGAL DUMPING; DISCARDING LIGHTED
 MATERIALS; CRIMINAL PENALTIES.
 SECTION 2.  Section 365.012, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (d-1), (p), (q), and (r) and
 amending Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person commits an offense if:
 (1)  the person discards lighted litter, including a
 match, cigarette, or cigar, onto open-space land, a private road or
 the right-of-way of a private road, a public highway or other public
 road or the right-of-way of a public highway or other public road,
 or a railroad right-of-way; and
 (2)  a fire is ignited as a result of the conduct
 described by Subdivision (1).
 (d)  An offense under Subsection (a), (b), or (c) [this
 section] is a Class C misdemeanor if the litter or other solid waste
 to which the offense applies weighs five pounds or less or has a
 volume of five gallons or less.
 (d-1)  An offense under Subsection (a-1) is a misdemeanor
 under this subsection if the litter or other solid waste to which
 the offense applies weighs less than 500 pounds or has a volume of
 less than 100 cubic feet and is punishable by:
 (1)  a fine not to exceed $500;
 (2)  confinement in jail for a term not to exceed 30
 days; or
 (3)  both such fine and confinement.
 (e)  An offense under Subsection (a), (b), or (c) [this
 section] is a Class B misdemeanor if the litter or other solid waste
 to which the offense applies weighs more than five pounds but less
 than 500 pounds or has a volume of more than five gallons but less
 than 100 cubic feet.
 (p)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under
 Subsection (a-1) that the person discarded the lighted litter in
 connection with controlled burning the person was conducting in the
 area into which the lighted litter was discarded.
 (q)  The operator of a public conveyance in which smoking
 tobacco is allowed shall post a sign stating the substance of
 Subsections (a-1) and (d-1) in a conspicuous place within any
 portion of the public conveyance in which smoking is allowed.
 (r)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under Subsection
 (a-1) also constitutes an offense under Subsection (a), the actor
 may be prosecuted only under Subsection (a-1).  If conduct that
 constitutes an offense under Subsection (a-1) also constitutes an
 offense under Chapter 28, Penal Code, the actor may be prosecuted
 under Subsection (a-1) or Chapter 28, Penal Code, but not both.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *