Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1047 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson S.B. No. 1047
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 March 28, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; March 28, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1047 By:  Jackson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of an innovation and commercialization
 organization associated with the Lyndon B. Johnson Space Center to
 receive funding from the Texas emerging technology fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 490.001, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Research institution" means:
 (A)  a public institution of higher education; or
 (B)  an innovation and commercialization
 organization associated with the Lyndon B. Johnson Space Center of
 the National Aeronautics and Space Administration.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 490.151, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Amounts allocated from the fund for use as provided by
 this subchapter shall be reserved for incentives for private or
 nonprofit entities to collaborate with research institutions in
 this state [public] or private institutions of higher education in
 this state on emerging technology projects with a demonstrable
 economic benefit to this state.
 SECTION 3.  Section 490.251, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 490.251.  USE OF MONEY FOR ACQUISITION OF RESEARCH
 SUPERIORITY. Amounts allocated from the fund for use as provided by
 this subchapter shall be used to acquire new or enhance existing
 research superiority at research [public] institutions [of higher
 education] in this state.
 SECTION 4.  Section 490.252, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 490.252.  RESEARCH SUPERIORITY. For purposes of this
 subchapter, the employment by a research [an] institution [of
 higher education] of one or more world-class or nationally
 recognized researchers and associated assistants in an industry
 eligible to receive funding under Section 490.003 is considered
 "research superiority."
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (a), Section 490.253, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The committee shall review and consider proposals by
 research [public] institutions [of higher education] for:
 (1)  creating new research superiority;
 (2)  attracting existing research superiority from
 institutions not located in this state and other research entities;
 or
 (3)  enhancing existing research superiority by
 attracting from outside this state additional researchers and
 resources.
 SECTION 6.  Subsection (a), Section 490.256, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A research [An] institution [of higher education] may
 not knowingly attempt to attract an individual key researcher or
 research superiority identified for consideration for funding by
 another research institution in this state or a [public or] private
 institution of higher education in this state under this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 7.  Subsection (a), Section 490.257, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A research [public] institution [of higher education]
 must document specific benefits that this state may expect to gain
 as a result of attracting the research superiority before the
 institution may enter into a contract to receive funding or
 incentives under this subchapter.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *