By: West S.B. No. 1050 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 16, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; April 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the collection of certain information on a birth certificate. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 192.002, Health and Safety Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: (b) The section of the birth certificate entitled "For Medical and Health Use Only" is not part of the legal birth certificate. If the birth is the result of a labor induction or a cesarean section, the following information must be collected under that section of the birth certificate: (1) whether the labor induction or cesarean section was performed before the 40th week of gestation; and (2) whether the labor induction or cesarean section was medically indicated. (b-1) Information held by the department under the [that] section of the certificate described by Subsection (b) is confidential. That information may not be released or made public on subpoena or otherwise, except that release may be made for statistical purposes only so that no person, patient, or facility is identified, or to medical personnel of a health care entity, as that term is defined in Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, or appropriate state or federal agencies for statistical research. The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission [board] may adopt rules to implement Subsection (b) and this subsection. SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2011, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt any rules and the Department of State Health Services shall prescribe the form necessary to implement Section 192.002, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. Section 192.002, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, applies to the collection of information regarding a birth that occurs on or after January 1, 2012. The collection of information regarding a birth that occurred before that date is governed by the law in effect at the time of the birth, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *